ATUL SHARMA
-
About ATUL SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01010MP2006SGC018423 MADHYA PRADESH JAYPEE MINERALS LIMITED 612244900.0 Active 23/12/2011 - U10100MP2009SGC022639 MP MONNET MINING COMPANY LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 03/09/2011 - U10100MP2010SGC022879 MP JAYPEE COAL FIELDS LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 23/12/2011 - U10101CT2015SGC001636 KERWA COAL LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 28/01/2015 - U10102MP2005SGC017818 M.P. SAINIK COAL MINING PRIVATE LIMITED 332969400.0 Active 22/12/2011 - U10102MP2009SGC022672 MP AMRL (MORGA) COAL COMPANY LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 14/10/2011 - U10102MP2009SGC022673 MP AMRL (SEMARIA) COAL COMPANY LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 14/10/2011 - U10102MP2009SGC022674 MP AMRL (BICHARPUR) COAL COMPANY LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 14/10/2011 - U10102MP2009SGC022675 MP AMRL (MARKI BARKA) COAL COMPANY LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 14/10/2011 - U10200MP2009SGC021909 MP JAYPEE COAL LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 23/12/2011 - U14107MP2000PTC014317 KATNI BAUXITE PRIVATE LIMITED 4900000.0 Active 01/07/2013 - U26960MP1996PTC010326 KISAN MINERAL PRIVATE LIMITED 46000000.0 Active 01/07/2013 - -
Associated with Directors