AJAY SEHGAL
-
About AJAY SEHGAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U11200DL2008PLC173434 GAGAN POWER LIMITED 17000000.0 Active 20/10/2012 - U40300DL1989PLC035213 GAGAN INFRAENERGY LIMITED 1395163100.0 Active 02/07/2011 - U40300DL2011PLC224178 JINDAL ANGUL POWER LIMITED 500000.0 Active 23/05/2014 - U74899DL1995PLC066506 OPELINA FINANCE AND INVESTMENT LTD 188368810.0 Active 02/07/2011 - U74899DL1995PTC069076 ENLIGHTENED CONSULTANCY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 12790000.0 Active 15/04/2017 -