ANIL BHAT
-
About ANIL BHAT,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40100DL2017PTC318318 AMPLUS KN ONE POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/05/2017 - U40106DL2017PTC314694 AMPLUS RJ SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/03/2017 - U40300DL2016PTC289315 AMPLUS POWER SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 37890000.0 Active 18/05/2016 - U40300DL2016PTC307480 AMPLUS ANDHRA POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 18800000.0 Active 23/11/2016 - U40300DL2017PTC314693 AMPLUS KN SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED 45040000.0 Active 20/03/2017 - U40300DL2017PTC314768 AMPLUS GREEN POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/03/2017 - U40300DL2017PTC314771 AMPLUS COASTAL POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/03/2017 - U72200DL2014PTC266272 BLYTICS TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/03/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
OJASVI JAGDISH GUPTA Director THOMAS MATHEW Director VIKAS SAREEN Director SHASHI KAUL Director