ANANTA SENAPATI
-
About ANANTA SENAPATI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200WB2010PTC154401 GAURINATH DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U45200WB2010PTC154404 YOGESWARI BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U45400WB2010PTC153442 NATURAL MULTISTORIED PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U45400WB2010PTC153447 NATURAL GRIHA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U45400WB2013PTC198319 DARUJA ENCLAVE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U45400WB2013PTC198323 ANIBRATA HEIGHTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U45400WB2013PTC198328 INDOLENT STRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U45400WB2013PTC198329 DARLITA AWASAN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U45400WB2013PTC198332 CUBICULUM NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U45400WB2013PTC198342 DOLOSE INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U45400WB2013PTC198343 AKHROT DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U45400WB2013PTC198344 KREETARTH CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U45400WB2013PTC198346 BENDIGO BUILTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U45400WB2013PTC198347 BASHIGA REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U51109WB1995PTC072555 CENTRACON FINEVEST PVT LTD 950000.0 Active 24/03/2017 - U51909WB1997PTC082828 SWAPNIL MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 2990200.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U72900WB2003PTC097288 PRATIVA ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 2350000.0 Active 17/06/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
MUKESH KUMAR SHARMA Director MANISH KUMAR SHARMA Director MAUMITA ROY Director