ARCHANA SARDA
-
About ARCHANA SARDA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51900WB2007PTC113686 ALTIUS IMPORT AND EXPORT PRIVATE LIMITED 555000.0 Active 06/01/2015 - U51909WB1998PTC088442 SHRISTI COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 4100200.0 Active 01/10/2014 - U51909WB2010PTC141463 IDEAL DEALCOMM PRIVATE LIMITED 100100.0 Active 31/03/2015 - U51909WB2010PTC141806 ASTRIX SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 101000.0 Active 06/02/2015 - U52100WB2010PTC144125 DHANTERAS COMMOSALES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/01/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
JUGAL KISHORE SARDA Director AMIT SARDA Director MAHAL CHAND SARDA Director