ASHOK KUMAR LAL
-
About ASHOK KUMAR LAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U70109DL2006PTC150561 CITYWALK INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/03/2015 - U74899DL1981PTC011790 SINDHWANI METAL ENGINEERING PVT LTD 16859500.0 Active 30/03/2016 - U74899DL1990PTC042175 FORPRO CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/07/2014 - U74899DL1996PTC078877 NIYOJIT FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/11/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
SNIGDHA LAL Director SANGEETA LAL Director SUKRITA ARORA Director