ARIHANT GIRIA
-
About ARIHANT GIRIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45309WB2017PTC220814 AMBUD BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/06/2017 - U51909WB2010PTC151358 DHANLABH VINTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/01/2015 - U51909WB2010PTC154217 HIMACHAL VINTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/09/2014 - U51909WB2011PTC163541 HOLISTIC SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/01/2015 - U51909WB2011PTC163903 OPINION VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/01/2015 - U51909WB2011PTC163910 HYTONE TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/01/2015 - U51909WB2011PTC164178 LINTON VINTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/09/2014 - U70101WB2005PTC106700 R P S TOWER PVT LTD 150100.0 Active 05/01/2017 - U74140WB2011PTC163548 PROFOUND ADVISORY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/01/2015 - U74999WB2011PTC163547 ZEALOUS DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/01/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
ARPIT GIRIA Director SAGAR KUMAR GIRIA Director SUNIL KUMAR GIRIA Director JAY PRAKASH BANTHIA Director