ASHOK KACHARDAS KARNAVAT
-
About ASHOK KACHARDAS KARNAVAT,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24110MH1981PTC025793 RELIANCE UNICORN ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/03/2017 - U31101MH1994PLC243148 ROSA POWER SUPPLY COMPANY LIMITED 4248233000.0 Active 26/05/2016 - U40102MH2006PLC190557 SASAN POWER LIMITED 43631530000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U65999MH2009PLC189285 RELIANCE WEALTH MANAGEMENT LIMITED 175000000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U67120MH2006PLC160589 RELIANCE MONEY INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED 960000000.0 Active 25/03/2015 - U72900MH2000PTC128384 RELIANCE MONEY SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 600515000.0 Active 09/09/2015 - U74999MH2006PTC165070 RELIANCE MONEY PRECIOUS METALS PRIVATE LIMITED 250000000.0 Active 25/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors