AJIT KUMAR SHARMA
-
About AJIT KUMAR SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909WB2011PTC157049 INTIMATE SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/09/2015 - U51909WB2011PTC157052 KEYSTAR VANIJYA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/09/2015 - U51909WB2011PTC157053 PEARS DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/09/2015 - U51909WB2011PTC157055 SARGAM COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/09/2015 - U52100WB2016PTC210196 JAGSAKTI STOCKISTS & TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/05/2016 - U52100WB2016PTC210197 PUSHPA KAMAL STOCKISTS & TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/05/2016 - U52100WB2016PTC210380 JAGSAKTI COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/05/2016 - U74900WB2014PTC203896 SHIVDHARA IMPORT & EXPORT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/11/2015 - U74900WB2014PTC204659 DREAMVIEW HI-RISE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/09/2015 - U74900WB2014PTC204739 MORVIND VYAPAAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/09/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
DEO KUMAR SHAW Director BHAIRAV MAHTO Director RAVI SINGHAL Director GOURI SHANKAR YADAV Director