ANIL KUMAR
-
About ANIL KUMAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01112CH1992PLC011970 HIMALAYAN AYURVEDIC AND AGRO RESEARCH CENTRE LTD 3730700.0 Active 06/08/2015 - U15100MP2017PTC042737 SUNDER DAIRY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/02/2017 - U55100HP2016PTC006195 VINDHYACHAL HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/01/2017 - U63090HP2016PTC006194 VINDHYACHAL PACKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/02/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
JAYANTA KUMAR SAHA Director AMIT ADWIN Director DAVINDAR SINGH SOKHI Director