AJAY SHIVKUMAR MEHROTRA
-
About AJAY SHIVKUMAR MEHROTRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40105DL2009PTC191346 SAIDHAM OVERSEAS PRIVATE LIMITED 152100000.0 Active 19/01/2016 - U40106AP2010PTC069210 VASAVI SOLAR POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 153000000.0 Active 01/10/2016 - U40106TG2009PTC065856 BHANU SOLAR PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/10/2017 - U40106TG2010PTC071541 LANCO SOLAR SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 6000000.0 Active 03/10/2017 - U40108TG2008PTC061286 PASIPHAE POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/10/2017 - U40108TG2009PTC065840 KHAYA SOLAR PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 286323200.0 Active 21/11/2017 - U40300TG2008PTC059248 LANCO SOLAR POWER PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 13631000.0 Active 03/10/2017 - U40300TG2009PTC066023 ORION SOLAR PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 5100000.0 Active 03/10/2017 - U45400DL2010PTC207962 GOLDEN INFRAPROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/10/2016 - U74140PN2008PTC131227 ELECTROMECH MARITECH PRIVATE LIMITED 152100000.0 Active 01/10/2016 - -
Associated with Directors