ASHWYN KUMAR NAYAK
-
About ASHWYN KUMAR NAYAK,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U13100KA2004PTC035223 TUMKUR MINERALS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/09/2016 - U26921GA1991PTC001168 VMSALGAOCAR CORPORATION PRIVATE LIMITED 10500000.0 Active 20/08/2016 - U35111GA1965PTC000048 V.M.SALGAOCAR AND BROTHER PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 20/08/2016 - U65923GA1993PTC001416 PYRAMID FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 90000000.0 Active 21/09/2017 - U65993GA1981PTC000432 SHIVRANJANI INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 22/07/2017 - U65993GA1992PTC001305 SHIVRANJANI SECURITIES COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 2802000.0 Active 19/09/2017 - U70101GA1999PTC002760 GANAPAL REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/09/2017 - U70101GA1999PTC002761 GANARAJ REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/09/2017 - U70101GA1999PTC002764 MEDINI REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/09/2017 - U70101GA1999PTC002766 DHANISTHA REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/09/2017 - -
Associated with Directors