ARUN KUMAR JULKA
-
About ARUN KUMAR JULKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U29308MH2017PTC300690 OCS ENERGY SERVICES INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 11/10/2017 - U29309MH2017PTC300504 OCS TECHNICAL SOLUTIONS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/10/2017 - U74210MH1996PTC103138 OCS SERVICES (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 275000.0 Active 16/01/2017 - U74999MH2017PTC299751 OCS INTEGRATED SOLUTIONS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 14/09/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
HITESH BHARATKUMAR RESHAMWALA Director MING YEN YIP Director DINESH REHANI Director