ANUPRITA BRIJMOHAN DAGA
-
About ANUPRITA BRIJMOHAN DAGA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U29299MH1987PLC045446 RELIANCE MEDIAWORKS LIMITED 11380794155.0 Active 18/07/2017 - U64200MH2005PLC158355 RELIANCE BROADCAST NETWORK LIMITED 397255850.0 Active 26/06/2017 - U67120MH2006PLC160589 RELIANCE MONEY INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED 960000000.0 Active 20/09/2017 - U74990MH2009PLC189525 RELIANCE CORPORATE ADVISORY SERVICES LIMITED 12356500000.0 Active 24/04/2017 - U74999MH2006PTC165070 RELIANCE MONEY PRECIOUS METALS PRIVATE LIMITED 250000000.0 Active 19/04/2017 - -
Associated with Directors