ASHISH VIMALKANT GAGGAR
-
About ASHISH VIMALKANT GAGGAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200MH1996PTC100732 LODHA CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/07/2017 - U45200MH2007PTC168405 JINESHWER REAL ESTATE AND FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/06/2017 - U45209MH2018PTC305535 GRANDEZZA SUPREMOUS THANE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/02/2018 - U70100MH1987PTC042108 LODHA BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 01/07/2017 - U70102MH2007PTC166667 MARUTINANDAN REAL ESTATE DOVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/07/2017 - U74999MH2015PTC260733 EIRIAN CONSULTING PRIVATE LIMITED 191110.0 Active 25/05/2017 - U74999MH2016PTC287928 IMSA COMPUTER EDUCATION PRIVATE LIMITED 0.0 Active 25/05/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
KANISHKA JAIRAJ PHATAK Director RAMESHCHANDRA CHECHANI Director