BHUPENDRA MANGALDAS SHAH
-
About BHUPENDRA MANGALDAS SHAH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909GJ1980PTC003953 PINNACLE SHARES REGISTRY PRIVATE LIMITED 2400000.0 Active 26/04/1995 - U74940GJ2012PTC070779 WELLCROW PHOTOGEARS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 18/06/2012 - U74999GJ2012PTC070871 CRESQUE DESIGN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/06/2012 - U85300GJ2017NPL099203 AIC-LMCP FOUNDATION 30000.0 Active 22/09/2017 - U93000GJ2012NPL071906 AHMEDABAD UNIVERSITY SUPPORT FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 11/09/2012 -