BIMAL KUMAR MUNDHRA
-
About BIMAL KUMAR MUNDHRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109WB1994PTC062805 SPACEPLUS AGENCIES PVT LTD 25950000.0 Active 01/02/2005 - U51109WB1994PTC064823 RIKZEN CONTRA PVT LTD 27400000.0 Active 12/09/1994 - U51109WB2006PTC111089 PANCHAM VANIJYA PRIVATE LIMITED 12650000.0 Active 28/08/2006 - U51109WB2008PTC128506 BRAND MERCHANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 13/08/2008 - U51109WB2011PTC171237 PRIMELINK TRADELINKS PRIVATE LIMITED 266000.0 Active 26/12/2011 - U51900WB2007PTC119089 BLISS DEALCOMM PRIVATE LIMITED 16300000.0 Active 01/10/2007 - U51909WB1993PTC058228 ARHAM COMMERCIAL COMPANY PVT LTD 8700000.0 Amalgamated 01/02/2005 - U51909WB1993PTC058549 FRONTIER VANIJYA PVT LTD 22200000.0 Active 01/02/2005 - U51909WB2007PTC118887 ALBRIGHT AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 3850000.0 Active 21/09/2007 - U51909WB2007PTC118888 ZEN MERCHANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 6350000.0 Active 21/09/2007 - U51909WB2007PTC119090 CYGNUS TREXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 1300000.0 Amalgamated 01/10/2007 - U51909WB2007PTC119188 RIGHT COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 2600000.0 Active 04/10/2007 - U51909WB2008PTC128456 MOONVIEW TREXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 17648500.0 Active 25/06/2015 - U51909WB2008PTC128509 CAMEX IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 13/08/2008 - U51909WB2008PTC128510 SUPARAS IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 13/08/2008 - U51909WB2011PTC171234 REMIND VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 266000.0 Active 26/12/2011 - -
Associated with Directors
KAMAL KISHOR MUNDHRA Director ALOK KUMAR PINCHA Director SACHIN DUGAR Director