BIJAY KUMAR DALAN
-
About BIJAY KUMAR DALAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51102WB1982PLC034740 VASAVADATTA INVESTMENT TRADING COMPANY LTD 500000.0 Active 28/10/2011 - U51109WB2008PTC121388 SBS TRADERS AND AGENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/01/2008 - U51109WB2009PLC136827 JPM MERCHANDISE AGENCIES LIMITED 24383630.0 Active 30/10/2012 - U51218WB1965PLC026362 NORTH TUKVAR TEA COMPANY LIMITED 24037500.0 Active 20/08/1996 - U51433WB1982PLC034739 PRECIOUS SERVICES CONSULTANCY LIMITED 500000.0 Active 16/04/2011 - U51909WB1940PLC009971 ZENITH DISTRIBUTORS & AGENTS LIMITED. 1875000.0 Active 31/01/2000 - U67120WB1988PLC043869 MANAV INVESTMENT AND TRADING COMPANY LTD 64910280.0 Active 30/04/2001 - U70109WB1946PLC014112 BIRLA BUILDINGS LIMITED 2400000.0 Active 26/08/2011 - U85110WB1981NPL033456 B K BIRLA FOUNDATION 0.0 Active 04/07/2003 - -
Associated with Directors