BABITA AGARWAL
-
About BABITA AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01132AS1995PTC004393 BARAK AGRO PVT LTD 2706000.0 Active 31/03/2015 - U27107AS1989PTC003235 BARAK VALLEY ALLOYS PVT LTD 14370000.0 Active 31/03/2015 - U51909AS1996PTC004787 BARAK ENTRADE PVT LTD 37455000.0 Active 24/06/1996 - U70101AS1998PTC005472 BARAK DEVELOPERS PVT LTD 3494000.0 Active 10/01/2015 - U85101AS1998PTC005593 SUNLIT HOSPITALS AND RESEARCH CENTRE PRIVATE LIMITED 4454500.0 Active 13/01/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
RAJENDRA KUMAR AGARWAL Director