BULBUL GUPTA
-
About BULBUL GUPTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U60210TN1962PTC004874 NEW INDIA MARITIME AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/03/2016 - U63090TN1997PTC039235 MOON LIGHT SHIPPING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/01/2016 - U74210TN1986PTC013328 GREEN WAYS SHIPPING AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/06/2014 - U74900TN1983PTC010471 A.S. SHIPPING AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/08/1996 - U74999TN1981PTC009093 RANEE ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/03/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
ROSHNI BERIWALA Director RAJ RANI DEVI Director JOHNSON THANGAVEL Director LALIT BERIWALA Director