BARINDRA KUMAR SARKAR
-
About BARINDRA KUMAR SARKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L27102OR1979PLC000819 ORISSA SPONGE IRON AND STEEL LIMITED 297900000.0 Active 10/05/2010 - U51909WB1998PTC086724 B.K.S.ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 842000.0 Active 04/04/1998 - U65999WB1997PTC082841 LSI FINANCIAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 5528000.0 Active 01/02/2018 - U74120WB2010PLC150300 LSI ENGINEERING & CONSULTANTS LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 03/01/2015 - -
Associated with Directors