BINDIYA NARULA
-
About BINDIYA NARULA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U18109DL2015PTC276887 TRUE KIDS WORLD PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 19/02/2015 - U52100DL2015PTC275889 KIDDOZ WORLD.COM PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 23/01/2015 - U67190DL2010PTC202430 LILLIPUT HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/05/2010 - U70109DL2015PTC277741 MAGNETIC LEASING PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 10/03/2015 - U74999DL2016PTC301957 ANACONDA LEGAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 23/06/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
SUNIL DAWER Director MONISH PRAVIN GHATALIA Director SANJEEV NARULA Director ARUN JAIN Director