BABULAL MULCHAND VARMA
-
About BABULAL MULCHAND VARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40107MH2008PTC184836 OMNITECH OILFIELD SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/07/2008 - U45202MH2008PTC187463 ICON SPACES PRIVATE LIMITED 1100000.0 Active 05/03/2015 - U45202MH2011PTC217055 TRANSWORLD INFRAPROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 5100000.0 Active 18/05/2012 - U70100MH2005PTC157754 OMKAR REALTORS & DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 96590600.0 Active 02/12/2005 - U70102MH2009PTC197762 OMKAR REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 295100000.0 Active 10/12/2009 - U74999MH2008PTC183663 OMKAR NATURAL RESOURCES PRIVATE LIMITED 70000000.0 Active 18/06/2008 - U80301MH2008PTC183720 PROGRESSIVE INSTITUTES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/06/2008 - U80900MH2009NPL196511 STRIVE INDIA EDUCATION FOUNDATION 200000000.0 Active 16/10/2009 - U85310MH2014NPL256635 OMKAR FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 19/11/2014 - -
Associated with Directors