BIMLA MODI
-
About BIMLA MODI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45202WB1995PTC076232 SHEETAL ESTATES PVT LTD 717000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 26/02/1997 - U50102WB2008PTC123996 GOODWILL DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/02/2011 - U51109WB2007PTC115179 AXIS TIE-UP PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/11/2008 - U51109WB2007PTC115182 JAISHANKAR DEALCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/11/2008 - U51109WB2008PTC123740 NAVYUG COMTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/01/2012 - U51109WB2008PTC123764 PRINCE VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/03/2013 - U51109WB2008PTC123771 UNIWORTH VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/01/2012 - U51109WB2008PTC123775 TIRUBALA VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/01/2012 - U51109WB2008PTC123814 MANGALDEEP VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/01/2012 - U51909WB2007PTC114639 PAWAN COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/02/2011 - U51909WB2007PTC115300 WISE TRADECOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/11/2008 - U51909WB2007PTC115753 ORCHID VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/11/2008 - U51909WB2008PTC123850 BASUKINATH TRADELINK PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/01/2012 - U51909WB2008PTC123948 GOLDEN TRADELINK PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2008 - U51909WB2008PTC123950 WELLMAN VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2008 - U51909WB2010PTC149207 HOPEWELL TIE-UP PRIVATE LIMITED 15100000.0 Active 25/05/2010 - -
Associated with Directors
RAMESH KUMAR GUPTA Director SHIV NARAYAN GUPTA Director TRIPURARI SINGH Director NATHMAL MODI Director