BHAVARDEVI VISHWANATH AGARWAL
-
About BHAVARDEVI VISHWANATH AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51900MH1987PTC043451 LUV-KUSH TRADERS PVT LTD 1000000.0 Active 28/03/1995 - U52100MH1988PTC048766 DONEAR RETAIL PRIVATE LIMITED 2491000.0 Active 24/10/2013 - U67120MH1986PTC038552 R. AJAYKUMAR REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 2497000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 07/01/1986 - U70102MH2009PTC193821 UN REALITY PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 01/04/2014 - U70102MH2009PTC193853 V.R.A. REALITY PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 07/07/2009 - -
Associated with Directors
NEENA AJAY AGARWAL Director RAHUL RAJENDRA AGARWAL Director UMADEVI RAJENDRA AGARWAL Director