BIMLA TIWARI
-
About BIMLA TIWARI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45207WB1996PTC078121 SHREEPATI PROPERTIES PVT LTD 100600.0 Active 18/05/2001 - U70102WB1995PTC070095 RBP PROJECTS & FIANANCE PVT LTD 1481160.0 Active 28/03/1995 - U70200WB1981PTC033496 MAHANAGAR PROPERTIES PVT LTD 490000.0 Active 15/11/1993 - U93000WB2013PTC198013 OIJO MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 21/10/2013 - -
Associated with Directors
RAM KARAN TIWARI Director PRAGYA TIWARI Director YATINDRA NATH MISHRA Director KAVI SAMIR BHANSALI Director