BARIK BISWAS
-
About BARIK BISWAS,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01403WB2013PTC194330 SANGRAMPUR AGRO FOOD PRODUCT PRIVATE LIMITED 12000000.0 Active 06/06/2013 - U15549WB2016PTC215568 GHATAKPUKUR AGRO FOOD PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED 21050000.0 Active 04/10/2017 - U51109WB2007PTC120528 PEARL DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 37745000.0 Active 30/10/2017 - U70109WB2016PTC216905 SKYTECH REALTY DEVELOPER PRIVATE LIMITED 4000000.0 Active 01/08/2016 - U74900WB2013PTC198869 LIMRA FREEZPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/12/2013 - -
Associated with Directors