CHANDRA SHEKHAR MATHUR
-
About CHANDRA SHEKHAR MATHUR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27100MH2000PTC127807 THYSSENKRUPP ELECTRICAL STEEL INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 3149349000.0 Active 09/09/2000 - U29199DL1996PTC082591 ENGEL MACHINERY INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 3500000.0 Active 11/10/1996 - U29295DL1995PTC166241 SMS PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY PRIVATE LIMITED 229584750.0 Active 10/10/2003 - U67190DL1996PTC078233 MOHINDER PURI AND COMPANY PRIVATE LIMTED 6800000.0 Active 17/04/1996 - U72200PN1997PTC014786 MAGNA STEYR INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 300000000.0 Active 15/09/1997 - U74140DL1991PTC044890 ARBITER CONSULTING PRIVATE LIMITED 5162520.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 31/07/2002 - U74140DL1994PTC057018 ASM RESEARCH PRIVATE LIMITED 5916660.0 Active 17/10/2005 - U74140DL2004PTC124745 WTS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 4290000.0 Active 19/02/2004 - U74140DL2008PTC176661 R P MALHAN & COMPANY CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/04/2008 - U74899DL1992PTC050702 NEOLITE ZKW LIGHTINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 135621800.0 Active 31/01/2015 - U74999DL2001NPL112520 INDO AUSTRIAN BUSINESS FORUM 0.0 Active 19/05/2005 - U99999MH1956NPL009708 THE INDO GERMAN CHAMBER OF COMMERCE 0.0 Active 21/10/2013 - -
Associated with Directors