CHENNURU SRI LAKSHMI
-
About CHENNURU SRI LAKSHMI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24219TG1996PTC025330 APARNA CONSTRUCTIONS AND ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000000.0 Active 01/04/2005 - U40105TG2008PTC057813 APARNA ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/07/2014 - U45200TG2007PTC055071 APARNA VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/07/2014 - U45202TG2000PTC035823 ALEK DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 15/04/2005 - U45202TG2000PTC035824 BINITHA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 15/04/2005 - U45309TG2000PTC035801 ABHIVAMSI DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 15/04/2005 - U65910TG1996PTC024637 MOUNIKA FINANCE AND LEASING PRIVATE LIMITED 120000.0 Active 19/03/2009 - U70100TG2013PTC089853 APARNA MEADOWS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/07/2014 - U70100TG2013PTC090137 APARNA SPRINGFIELDS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/07/2014 - U70102TG2000PTC034086 AARTHY DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Amalgamated 02/02/2005 - U70102TG2000PTC034091 RANADHEER ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Amalgamated 02/02/2005 - U70109TG2016PTC111294 APARNA GREEN RESIDENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/08/2016 - U70200TG2016PTC111321 APARNA URBAN TENEMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/08/2016 - U93000TG2008PTC057812 APARNA HEALTH SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/07/2014 - -
Associated with Directors