CHANDRA SHYAM RUIA
-
About CHANDRA SHYAM RUIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51101MH2012PTC227335 MESMERIC TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/02/2012 - U51900MH1956PTC009756 M RAMNARAIN PRIVATE LIMITED 1345000.0 Active 11/12/2006 - U51900MH1980PTC023260 S M R TRADING AND INVESTMENT COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/07/1989 - U51900MH1980PTC023261 K M R TRADING INVESTMENT COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/07/1989 - U51900MH1993PTC072846 AMAYSR TRADING AND INVESTMENT COMPANY PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 14/07/1993 - U65990MH1966PTC013511 THE RELIANCE INVESTMENT COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 27/07/1989 - U99999MH1995NPL086507 MRR CHARITIES 210000.0 Active 03/10/2000 - -
Associated with Directors
SHYAM MADANMOHAN RUIA Director INDRA GIRDHARLAL DURLABHJI Director ASHOK VISHWANATH BHAVE Director