CHANDER MOHAN NARULA
-
About CHANDER MOHAN NARULA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U19129DL1995PTC073900 VISHNU INTERNATIONAL PRIVATE LIMITED 22700000.0 Active 01/04/2005 - U28999HP1982PTC004888 HIMACHAL TIN PRINTERS PVT LTD 833000.0 Active 30/01/1984 - U45201DL2006PTC144397 RTV CONTRACTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/03/2015 - U70101DL2006PTC148378 CMD BUILT-TECH PRIVATE LIMITED. 10000000.0 Under Liquidation 19/04/2006 - U70109DL2006PTC149951 CMD USHAY BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/03/2015 - U70109DL2006PTC150052 CMD CONSTRUCTION CO. PRIVATE LIMITED 40000000.0 Active 01/02/2008 - U74899DL1979PTC009968 NARULA METALS PVT LTD 208300.0 Active 05/11/1979 - U74899DL1998PLC096301 NARULA CAN INDUSTRIES LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 17/09/1998 - -
Associated with Directors
NEERAJ NARULA Director SUNITA NARULA Director RAKESH KHANNA Director PANKAJ NARULA Director