CHINTAN SUKETU SHAH
-
About CHINTAN SUKETU SHAH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109GJ2001PTC040278 VERITAS ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 30/12/2003 - U65910GJ1992PTC018613 TRIUMPH IMPEX AND HOLDINGS PVT LTD 920000.0 Active 24/11/1992 - U66010GJ2006PTC049215 VERITAS INSURANCE SERVICES PVT. LTD. 100000.0 Active 10/10/2006 - U67120GJ2007PTC051252 VERITAS HOLDING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/06/2007 - U67200GJ2007PTC051258 VERITAS INSURANCE BROKING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 02/07/2007 - U74999GJ1995PLC025430 TRIUMPH ENTERPRISES LIMITED 500000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 07/04/1995 - -
Associated with Directors
MAHARSHEE MADHUKARBHAI MUNSHAW Director NEERAV SUKETU SHAH Director SWATI CHINTAN SHAH Director