CHINMOY DAVARA
-
About CHINMOY DAVARA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15543CT1999PTC013296 SAMRIDHI BEVERAGES PRIVATE LIMITED 103000.0 Active 30/09/2000 - U45201CT1988PTC004684 CHINMOY BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 203800.0 Active 06/06/1991 - U55101CT2008PTC020528 CHINMOY ABHISHEK HERITAGE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/01/2008 - U70102CT2008PTC020922 C. P. TOWNSHIP AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/11/2008 - -
Associated with Directors
PRAKASH DAVARA Director PREETI DAVARA Director NARENDRA DAVARA Director ABHISHEK AGRAWAL Director