DAMODAR KRISHAN AGGARWAL
-
About DAMODAR KRISHAN AGGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U19201DL1997PLC089315 SMC INVESTMENTS AND ADVISORS LIMITED 250000000.0 Active 23/06/2008 - U24333DL2005PTC135608 DEE FACES HERBAL PRIVATE LIMITED 85114000.0 Active 10/08/2007 - U67120DL1997PLC188881 SMC COMTRADE LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 20/11/2012 - U74120UP2013PTC054923 SMC REAL ESTATE ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 08/02/2013 - U74899DL1951GAP001947 PHD CHAMBER OF COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY 0.0 Active 31/12/2012 - U74899DL1994PLC063201 SMC CAPITALS LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 03/09/2007 - U74899DL1995PLC065781 JAI AMBEY SHARE BROKING LIMITED 7807000.0 Active 24/02/1995 - -
Associated with Directors