DINESH NAVNITLAL MODI
-
About DINESH NAVNITLAL MODI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L21010MH1992PLC069281 ARROW GREENTECH LIMITED 117399000.0 Active 05/08/2014 - U40101MH2004PTC146486 UTILITY ENERGYTECH ENGINEERS PRIVATE LIMITED 20080000.0 Amalgamated 21/05/2004 - U40109MH2003PLC141375 RELIANCE POWER TRANSMISSION LIMITED 500000.0 Active 31/03/2015 - U45200MH2003PTC140946 CREST LOGISTICS AND ENGINEERS PRIVATE LIMITED 346280050.0 Active 20/08/2015 - U51900MH1996PTC099105 SKYLINE GLOBAL TRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 6000000.0 Active 31/03/2015 - U51900MH2000PTC126435 SPICE COMMERCE AND TRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 11667000.0 Amalgamated 31/03/2015 - U51909MH1996PTC099106 SPACE TRADE ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 103000.0 Active 31/03/2015 - U65910MH2006PTC162605 SPECIES COMMERCE AND TRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 82696000.0 Active 04/02/2017 - U74140MH2008PTC186876 TULIP ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 330000.0 Active 13/10/2015 - -
Associated with Directors