DEVESH DINANATH CHATURVEDI
-
About DEVESH DINANATH CHATURVEDI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01403MH2011PTC222476 PRADEEP SANDEEP AGRICULTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/09/2011 - U51900MH1993PTC073121 HARINIM TRADE & TRAVELS PRIVATE LIMITED 1625000.0 Active 15/10/1996 - U65990MH1996PTC098266 HARINIM TOURS AND TRAVELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/03/2007 - U70100MH2011PTC215692 PRADEEP SANDEEP REALTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 03/04/2011 - U70101MH2010PTC209977 SYMETRIC REALTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 11/11/2010 - U70102MH2011PTC214189 ANGULAR REALTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 20/07/2017 - U92100MH1945PTC004400 SHRIYAM COMMODITIES INTERMEDIARY PRIVATE LIMITED 49000000.0 Converted to LLP 02/09/2006 - -
Associated with Directors