DEVIDAS NARAINDAS BUDHRANI
-
About DEVIDAS NARAINDAS BUDHRANI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200MH1995PTC085181 OPAL LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/03/1995 - U45200MH1995PTC085185 AVISHKAR LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/10/1995 - U45200MH1995PTC087282 FLAWLESS CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/05/1995 - U45200MH2011PTC215483 ANTARISHK LAND & ESTATE DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 205000.0 Active 29/03/2011 - U45201MH1995PTC087436 FLAGSTONE CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/05/1995 - U45203MH2008PTC188495 DEVIDAS CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/11/2008 - U45400MH2007PTC171704 DALAN CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/06/2007 - U45400MH2007PTC171706 SAMPURNA CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/06/2007 - U45400MH2007PTC171707 SADANAND REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/06/2007 - U45400MH2007PTC171709 SUNDER CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/06/2007 - U45400MH2010PTC208270 DEVIDAS BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 239900010.0 Active 27/09/2010 - U45400MH2011PTC215479 ZEON LAND & ESTATE DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 205000.0 Active 29/03/2011 - U51900MH1996PTC098690 DRISHTI OVERSEAS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/10/1996 - U65910MH1994PLC083335 BUDHRANI FINANCE LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 29/11/1994 - U70100MH1995PTC087944 GREENBACK CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/05/1995 - -
Associated with Directors