DIGAMBAR SHANKAR PHADTARE
-
About DIGAMBAR SHANKAR PHADTARE,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01122PN2007PTC131164 VELLA AGRO FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 27/12/2007 - U01400PN2008PTC132488 VAJRAGAD AGRO FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/07/2008 - U01400PN2008PTC132535 KADEPATHAR AGRO FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 31/07/2008 - U01400PN2008PTC132540 MALHARGAD AGRO FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 31/07/2008 - U45201PN2004PTC019040 ABJA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 20/10/2008 - U45203PN2009PTC135057 ABJA INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 27/11/2009 - U51311PN1996PTC017890 SAI LOGISTICS AND MATERIAL HANDLING PRIVATE LIMITED 15546500.0 Active 20/10/2008 - U70102PN2007PTC131142 KARHA DEVELOPERS & MINERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2100000.0 Active 20/02/2008 - U74140PN1982PTC028022 APP MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 77154000.0 Active 01/10/2005 - -
Associated with Directors