DINESH KUMAR MITTAL
-
About DINESH KUMAR MITTAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L15421WB1975PLC030118 BALRAMPUR CHINI MILLS LTD 235028327.0 Active 06/02/2014 - L24223PB1988PLC008031 MAX FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED 536768054.0 Active 01/01/2015 - L74899DL1995PLC070609 BHARTI AIRTEL LIMITED 19987000510.0 Active 13/03/2014 - L99999MH1992PLC066213 JET AIRWAYS (INDIA) LIMITED 1135973830.0 Active 01/11/2014 - L99999PB1990PLC010307 TRIDENT LIMITED 5095955670.0 Active 12/08/2017 - U40101TR2004PLC007544 ONGC TRIPURA POWER COMPANY LIMITED 11200000000.0 Active 27/09/2004 - U40101TR2005PTC008234 NORTH EAST POWER TRANSMISSION COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 15/04/2005 - U70100MP2016SGC035540 BHOPAL SMART CITY DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION LIMITED 2000000000.0 Active 13/12/2016 - U72200KA2006PTC038859 ATYATI TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 110808020.0 Active 17/11/2016 - U74140DL2014PTC263181 BUSINESS STRATEGY ADVISORY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/01/2014 - U74140MH2001PTC134220 HSBC ASSET MANAGEMENT (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 615909080.0 Active 05/02/2014 - -
Associated with Directors