DALIP NAGAR
-
About DALIP NAGAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L74130DL1984PLC019469 GALAXY COMMERCIAL LIMITED 12125000.0 Active 01/06/2005 - U10100DL1996PLC251093 SPECTRUM COAL AND POWER LIMITED 416780890.0 Active 29/12/2016 - U36911DL2011PTC215127 GALAXY GEMS JEWELS & HANDICRAFTS PRIVATE LIMITED 5160000.0 Active 09/12/2016 - U40109AP1992PLC014937 SPECTRUM POWER GENERATION LTD. 4984987480.0 Active 26/12/2006 - U51909DL2008PTC172917 MASS AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 660000.0 Active 03/04/2008 - U51909DL2013PTC257570 LATENT LIGHT CORPORATION PRIVATE LIMITED 9410000.0 Active 11/09/2013 - U65999DL2006PTC151588 LATENT LIGHT ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 6682000.0 Active 26/09/2016 - -
Associated with Directors