DEEPA SUREKA
-
About DEEPA SUREKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45201DL1993PTC053428 VESHNOUDEVI PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 6820000.0 Active 01/08/1998 - U70109WB1990PTC048530 BHAMA PROPERTIES PVT LTD 1710200.0 Active 01/08/2003 - U74899DL1987PTC028748 RAM FORGINGS PRIVATE LTD 1050700.0 Active 25/04/1996 - U74899DL1987PTC028779 SHRI NARAYAN STEEL INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LTD 11358500.0 Active 26/04/1996 - U74899DL1990PTC041098 V.K. FLATS PRIVATE LIMITED 19300000.0 Active 29/01/1997 - -
Associated with Directors
PREM LATA SUREKA Director MADAN LAL AGGARWAL Director TIRLOK CHAND GOEL Director