DILIP MANEKCHAND SHETH
-
About DILIP MANEKCHAND SHETH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200GJ1995PTC027168 CHARMY DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/08/1995 - U45201GJ1991PTC016707 MOONROCK DEVELOPERS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 10/02/2000 - U45201GJ1992PTC017020 SUSAN BUILDEERS PVT LTD 200000.0 Active 01/11/2006 - U45201GJ1997PTC031812 BINESH BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/02/2000 - U67120GJ1995PTC027117 SARTHAK AVENUES PRIVATE LIMITED 235000.0 Active 07/02/2000 - -
Associated with Directors
ALKA MANSUKHLAL DESAI Director ATUL DILSUKHBHAI SHETH Director