DEEPAK KUMAR THAKKAR
-
About DEEPAK KUMAR THAKKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109DL2006PTC156281 AURIGA MARKETING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/12/2006 - U67190DL2005PLC134592 MOULIK ADVISORY SERVICES LIMITED 37500000.0 Active 23/04/2015 - U74899DL1994PTC063620 MAGNUS FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 52575000.0 Active 27/10/2008 - U74990DL2012PTC235356 D & M FINVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 499375.0 Active 04/05/2012 - U92412DL2006PTC148512 LEONIS MEDIA NETWORK PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/03/2007 - -
Associated with Directors
MADHU SUDAN CHOUDHARY Director VIJAY KUMAR Director RACHNA THAKKAR Director