DINESH KUMAR MEHROTRA
-
About DINESH KUMAR MEHROTRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L27100MH1907PLC000260 TATA STEEL LIMITED 9712158890.0 Active 22/10/2012 - L65910DL1986PLC023129 V L S FINANCE LIMITED 386620170.0 Active 28/05/2016 - U65910TN1988PTC015757 COMPUTER AGE MANAGEMENT SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 487600000.0 Active 06/03/2014 - U65999MH2008PLC185856 METROPOLITAN STOCK EXCHANGE OF INDIA LIMITED 4742418983.0 Active 05/01/2017 - U66010MH2000PLC128403 TATA AIA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED 19535000000.0 Active 12/02/2015 - U74900TN2011PLC080610 CAMS INSURANCE REPOSITORY SERVICES LIMITED 45416700.0 Active 19/01/2015 - U74999DL2007PLC277039 INDIAN ENERGY EXCHANGE LIMITED 303286240.0 Active 30/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors