DILIP SITARAM BHAMARE
-
About DILIP SITARAM BHAMARE,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15420MH1999PLC119202 SITARAM SUGARS AND ALLIED INDUSTRIES LIMITED 71101000.0 Active 31/03/1999 - U24110MH1988PTC049144 DHANWANTARY LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/01/1994 - U24233MH2012PTC235787 M.S. TECHNO CHEM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/07/2015 - U65990MH2006PTC160655 PRAMILA FINANCE AND INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2006 - U74900MH1999PTC119203 SITSON INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 48000000.0 Active 31/03/1999 - U74999DL2016PLC289446 VRD POWER PROJECTS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 08/01/2016 - U85300MH2017NPL299603 SITSON FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 11/09/2017 - U90001MH1995PTC090501 SITSON PROCESS CONTROL SYSTEMS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 12/07/1995 - U99999MH1991PTC060452 SAIKRIPA PAPER AND BOARD MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 2100000.0 Active 29/08/2001 - -
Associated with Directors