DEEPAK VISHWANATH HARLALKA
-
About DEEPAK VISHWANATH HARLALKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L17300MH1981PLC024184 GINI SILK MILLS LIMITED 55926000.0 Active 01/07/2010 - U17100MH1988PTC047476 GINI TEX PRIVATE LIMITED 14850000.0 Active 25/05/1988 - U17100MH1989PTC053328 SHREE GINI TEXTURISING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/09/1989 - U17116MH1983PTC029140 HARLALKA SILK MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 04/04/1989 - U17120MH1988PTC045952 GINI CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 20/01/1988 - U25100MH1951PTC008482 ASHIRWAD SHELTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 60000000.0 Active 28/12/1995 - U25110MH1985PTC036248 SWASTI VINAYAKA REALESTATE DEVELOPMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 15000000.0 Active 28/12/1995 - U51900MH1992PTC068322 HARCO OVERSEAS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 3500000.0 Converted to LLP 01/08/2013 - -
Associated with Directors