DINESH MITTAL
-
About DINESH MITTAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U11102DL1997PTC084498 YASH PROPANE AUTO ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 1797000.0 Active 04/05/2000 - U15500DL2011PTC212483 MAHAVEER AQUA PRIVATE LIMITED 2052400.0 Active 12/01/2011 - U27200DL1998PLC092505 MITTAL UDYOG LIMITED 2203280.0 Active 03/03/1998 - U27201DL1986PLC026129 SAVITRI BUILDWELL LIMITED 4712950.0 Active 19/11/1986 - U40200DL1981PLC012737 MAHAVEER CYLINDERS LIMITED 12400000.0 Active 09/06/1995 - U40300DL2010PLC209970 SM SUN POWER LIMITED 7500000.0 Active 22/02/2014 - U45200DL2006PTC156154 TIRUPATI INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL SCIENCE PRIVATE LIMITED 4500000.0 Active 30/01/2007 - U51900DL2007PTC162325 GCG ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 120000.0 Active 12/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors