DEVENDER DANG
-
About DEVENDER DANG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27109DL2003PTC123175 RAJINDRA ISPAT PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 21/11/2003 - U45200DL2006PTC153961 MEHAR INFRASTRUCTURE AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 3100000.0 Active 01/04/2010 - U45201DL2006PTC145815 TRIMURTI PROJECTS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 24/08/2012 - U50602DL1999PTC102504 GRACE PROJECTS AND CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 6602000.0 Active 22/11/1999 - U70109DL2006PTC151214 LEO INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED. 100000.0 Active 15/01/2007 - U70109DL2006PTC152187 SKYLINE INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED. 700000.0 Active 19/08/2006 - U70109DL2006PTC152735 HORIZON INFRADEVELOPER PRIVATE LIMITED. 100000.0 Active 30/08/2006 - U70109DL2012PTC238408 MEHAR VILLAS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/05/2013 -