DONTAMSETTI VENKAT MANOHAR
-
About DONTAMSETTI VENKAT MANOHAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L40102TG1993PLC015988 SHRI MATRE POWER & INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED 307071600.0 Active 25/07/1994 - U05004TG2008PTC059014 INDO THAI FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 1637470.0 Active 06/05/2008 - U40109TG1998PLC030031 SHRI SHAKTI ALTERNATIVE ENERGY LIMITED 71700000.0 Active 07/01/2012 - U55101TG1989PLC010115 SHRI SHAKTI RESORTS AND HOTELS LTD. 203598390.0 Active 14/06/1989 - U74999TG2017PTC116497 SMARTBIKE MOBILITY PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 12/04/2017 - U80901TG2012PTC084431 TRINADHA LEARNING ENVIRONMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 27/11/2012 - U85100TG2012NPL080040 HYDERABAD BICYCLING CLUB 100000.0 Active 30/03/2012 - -
Associated with Directors