DEEPAK MOHLA
-
About DEEPAK MOHLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L55200MH1967PLC013837 FOODS AND INNS LIMITED 16059420.0 Active 10/05/2017 - U74140DL1999PTC101714 INSPIRE ONE CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 5059600.0 Active 27/09/1999 - U74140DL2006PTC145629 INSPIREONE TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 31/01/2006 - U74210DL1985PLC019823 TECHNICO INDUSTRIES LIMITED 167510000.0 Active 05/03/2008 - U93010DL2002PTC117667 LIQVID ELEARNING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 101020284.0 Active 20/04/2006 - -
Associated with Directors